FL H1237 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pet stores to be licensed; authorizes pet stores to transfer or sell household pets under certain circumstances; limits household pet sources; provides for documentation, inspection, & records audit; authorizes DBPR to contract with veterinarian for inspections; requires denial of a license under certain circumstances; authorizes disciplinary or civil action; provides criminal penalties.
Title
Pet Stores
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1698 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1700 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1700 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 919 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1237 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1237/BillText/Filed/PDF |