FL H1235 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Florida Commission on Offender Review to develop & maintain database containing certain information for certain purpose; requires certain governmental entities to provide certain information to commission; requires DMS, acting through Florida Digital Service, to provide certain technical assistance to commission; requires commission to make database available to public on Internet website by certain date; requires commission to update database monthly & publish certain information on website; requires commission to provide comprehensive plan to Governor & Legislature by certain date; provides that person who takes certain actions in reasonable reliance on database may not be charged with certain violations of criminal law.
Title
Restoration of Voting Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1296 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1235 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1235/BillText/Filed/PDF |