FL H1235 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires processing of rental applications by servicemember's spouse/adult dependents within certain timeframe; requires DVA to create website to streamline procedure for application for certification as veteran business enterprise; authorizes Supreme Court to admit spouse of servicemember stationed in this state under certain circumstances; requires DOE to expedite processing of application for educator certification submitted by such spouse; requires State Board of Education to adopt rules to extend validity of temporary certificate of such spouse; provides legislative findings & intent to require collaboration between State Board of Education & Board of Governors of State University System in achieving specified goals regarding continuing education for veterans; provides appropriation.
Title
Military and Veteran Support
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | Rep. Chris Latvala [R] | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] |
Rep. Mel Ponder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-21 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-18 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/18/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-29 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1588 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
S1594 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1594 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
454 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 683 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |