FL H1233 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Task Force on the Prevention of Sexual Harassment and Misconduct; provides for task force membership, duties, responsibilities, & per diem; prohibits public officers, qualified candidates, agency employees, & lobbyists from sexually harassing individuals; provides penalties for lobbyists who violate prohibition against sexual harassment; requires Commission on Ethics to report to Governor & Cabinet, or Legislature upon violations of act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Harassment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1628 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
H7007 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112324Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback