FL H1233 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes OFR to furnish certain information relating to Federal Home Loan Banks pursuant to information sharing agreement; requires OFR to execute such agreement by specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Home Loan Banks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#634 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28 Chapter No. 2016-144
2016-03-25 Approved by Governor
2016-03-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2016-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2016-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2016-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2016-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1490
2016-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
2016-03-01SenateReceived
2016-03-01SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
2016-03-01SenateIn Messages
2016-02-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2016-02-24HouseRead 3rd time
2016-02-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-02-23HouseRead 2nd time
2016-02-19HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16
2016-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-04HouseFavorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2016-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 02/04/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2016-01-29HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-01-29HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2016-01-29HouseCS referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee
2016-01-29HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
2016-01-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-01-25HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2016-01-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/25/16, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2016-01-15HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1490 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1233 (Ch. 2016-144)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
655057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback