FL H1233 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exclusive remedy for personal injury or wrongful death arising out of medical injury; creates Patient Compensation System; provides for various offices & committees; provides for independent medical review panels; prohibits certain conflicts of interest; provides process for filing application; provides for disposition of application; provides for determination of compensation when there is sufficient proof of medical injury; provides that compensation shall be offset by any past & future collateral source payments; provides for determinations of malpractice for purposes of specified constitutional provision; provides for review of appeals by administrative law judge; requires annual contributions from specified providers; requires annual report; provides applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compensation for Personal Injury or Wrongful Death Arising Out of Medical Injury

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2012-01-12 Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 213
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 122
2012-01-05 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback