FL H1233 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes children 9 years of age or younger at time of referral within definition of those eligible to receive comprehensive mental health services; prohibits placement of certain children into secure, nonsecure, or home detention care before hearing; provides exceptions; encourages establishment of prearrest or postarrest diversion programs & to give first-time misdemeanor offenders & offenders 9 years of age or younger opportunity to participate, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-22 Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 281
2011-03-18 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 404 HOB
2011-03-14 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 220
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 110
2011-03-04 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394492Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985632Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback