FL H1233 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes extension to school district educational plant survey submission deadline; provides restrictions; provides requirements for submission of request for extension to DOE & requires department approval; provides restrictions on school district construction during extension period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational Plant Surveys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0847 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Messages
2010-04-21 In Messages
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 00804; CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00804
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00784
2010-04-07 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00629
2010-04-06 Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00629
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/07/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-29 Original reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; CS referred to Education Policy Council -HJ 00425; Now in Education Policy Council
2010-03-26 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-29 CS read 1st time on 03/29/10 -HJ 00415
2010-03-26 CS by PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00417
2010-03-24 On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 404-H
2010-03-03 Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00204
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00111
2010-02-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101331Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback