FL H1233 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1770, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires licensure to practice genetic counseling; provides licensure, licensure renewal, & continuing education requirements; prohibits certain acts; provides penalties & grounds for disciplinary action; authorizes DOH to enter certain orders; provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetic Counseling Patient Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1770, 1st Eng.
2021-04-19HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-19HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-19HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable by Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2021-04-12HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-12House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-09HouseCS Filed
2021-04-09HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-09HouseReported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-07HouseAdded to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-04-02HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-01House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-01HouseCS Filed
2021-04-01HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1235 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
S1770 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Ordered enrolled
S1772 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483918Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/Amendment/414413/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/Analyses/h1233.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/Analyses/h1233a.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/Analyses/h1233b.HCA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/Analyses/h1233c.HCA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/Analyses/h1233d.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1233/Analyses/h1233e.HHS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59747&IsPCB=0&BillId=72379
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60198&IsPCB=0&BillId=72379
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60545&IsPCB=0&BillId=72379

Bill Comments 750

feedback