FL H1221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists to order & dispense preexposure & postexposure prophylaxes to patients without prescriptions; requires pharmacists to complete specified training; authorizes pharmacists to order & dispense specified supplies of preexposure prophylaxes & full courses of postexposure prophylaxes to patients without prescriptions; prohibits health insurers from requiring prior authorizations or step-therapy protocols for antiretroviral drugs; prohibits health insurers from refusing to cover, or allowing pharmacy benefit managers to refuse to cover, preexposure & postexposure prophylaxes.
Title
Antiretroviral Drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1636 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
465 | 1861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1221 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1221/BillText/Filed/PDF |