FL H1215 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-258

Summary

Requires each member of Town of Southwest Ranches South Broward Utility Advisory Board to be water or sewer user within service area of former South Broward Utility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broward County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-258
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01286
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00947; Read 3rd time -SJ 00947; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00947
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00870; Referred to Rules -SJ 00870
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00908; Read 3rd time -HJ 00908; Passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00908
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00647; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00647
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-10 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00260; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00260
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-03 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00204
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00110
2010-02-23 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback