FL H1211 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1604 (Ch. 2016-212)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1604 (Ch. 2016-212)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises various provisions of Florida Drug & Cosmetic Act; repeals provisions relating to pedigree papers; prohibits distribution of prescription drugs without delivering transaction history, transaction information, & transaction statement; revises various permit requirements relating to prescription drug manufacturing, repackaging, & distribution; revises recordkeeping requirements; revises labeling requirements for prescription drug active pharmaceutical ingredient packaging; authorizes issuance of nondisciplinary citations.
Title
Drugs, Devices, and Cosmetics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1604 (Ch. 2016-212) |
2016-03-08 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 1604 |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/17/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-08 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/08/16, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-28 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-25 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/25/16, 4:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0261 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
S0176 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
S1604 (Similar To) 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-212
S0176 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
S1604 (Similar To) 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-212
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 9201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |