FL H1185 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits removal or disabling of part or device on lawnmower that is primarily for safety; provides noncriminal penalty.
Title
Lawnmower Safety Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1448 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1185 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1185/BillText/Filed/PDF |