FL H1175 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DCA to include in its report on Energy Economic Zone Pilot Program information relating to incentives available under program; exempts certain building materials used in construction or rehabilitation of energy-efficient structures & clean energy technology & manufacturing products from tax on sales, use, & other transactions; exempts energy economic zones from minimum wage requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Economic Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-14 Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 219
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 102
2011-03-03 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16332465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220182Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback