FL H1173 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides enhanced criminal penalties for certain trespassing offenses in school safety zones by person convicted of certain gang-related offenses; provides enhanced criminal penalties for person who intentionally causes, encourages, solicits, or recruits another person under specified age to become criminal gang member in certain circumstances; authorizes county & municipal detention facilities to designate individual responsible for assessing whether each inmate is criminal gang member or associate; provides duties of such individuals; revises criteria for application of sentencing multiplier for offenses related to criminal gangs; limits application of multiplier if application would result in lowest permissible sentence exceeding statutory maximum sentence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Gang Prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#953 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Criminal Justice
2012-03-05 Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 828
2012-03-05 Received -SJ 828
2012-02-29 In Messages
2012-02-29 CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 934
2012-02-29 Read 3rd time -HJ 934
2012-02-28 Placed on 3rd reading
2012-02-28 Read 2nd time -HJ 889
2012-02-24 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12
2012-02-23 CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 804
2012-02-23 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-02-22 CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 816
2012-02-20 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/22/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
2012-02-14 Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 602
2012-02-14 Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 602
2012-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB
2012-01-27 CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 291
2012-01-27 Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 297
2012-01-26 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-01-25 CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 298
2012-01-23 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/25/12, 11:00 am, 404 HOB
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 115
2012-01-09 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 115
2011-12-30 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8100975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback