FL H1153 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits contacting debtors in certain situations; provides requirements for each type of debtor; specifies length of each prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contacting Consumer Debtors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2022-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1424 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559721Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback