FL H1149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises Legislative Auditing Committee duties; specifies purpose of local government fiscal transparency requirements; requires local governments to post voting record information on websites; requires property appraisers & local governments to post property tax information & history on websites; requires public notices for public hearings & meetings before new tax increases; requires local governments to conduct debt affordability analyses; provides method for local governments to post certain required information.
Title
Local Government Fiscal Transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#499 (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations |
2020-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed; YEAS 77 NAYS 36 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 6 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-27 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4 |
2020-01-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 01/27/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |