FL H1135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates offense of lewd or lascivious grooming.
Title
Lewd or Lascivious Grooming
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Taylor Yarkosky [R] | Rep. Doug Bankson [R] |
Rep. Webster Barnaby [R] | Rep. Rachel Plakon [R] | Rep. Chase Tramont [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-01-29 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-22 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1238 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
800 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |