FL H1131 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes political subdivisions to insure for certain amounts to pay certain claims or judgments; provides requirements with respect to such insurance; prohibits payments in excess of such insurance limits from such political subdivisions; provides remedy against insurers who act in bad faith; authorizes counties to purchase umbrella policies to insure certain municipalities; authorizes parties to pursue judgments in excess of policy limits; provides applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sovereign Immunity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-01-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1812 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback