FL H1127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises required sentencing structure for prison releasee reoffenders upon proof establishing that defendant is prison releasee reoffender; removes provision ineligibility for early release & that requirement that prison releasee reoffender serve 100 percent of sentence; provides resentencing requirements.
Title
Prison Releasee Reoffender Sentencing
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Chambliss [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Dianne Hart [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Rep. Andrew Learned [D] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S210 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1127 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1127/BillText/Filed/PDF |