FL H1121 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises exemption from public records requirements for written reports of crashes; revises agencies that hold records to which exemption applies; removes time limit for exemption; revises entities to which records may be made available; requires certain entities to enter into memorandum of understanding; revises conditions precedent to accessing crash report; exempts certain computerized crash report data; provides exemption from public records requirements for driver information contained in uniform traffic citation; authorizes release of driver information under certain circumstances; provides for future review & repeal; provides statements of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Crash Reports and Traffic Citations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1614 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - CS by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 3

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback