FL H1121 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that nongovernmental organization that receives state funds in excess of certain amount provide detailed report of its expenditures; prescribes items that must be reported; requires that information be submitted electronically & posted on state website; specifies that agency contract must include provision that nongovernmental organization must comply with reporting requirements.
Title
Nongovernmental Organizations that Receive State Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 109 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 109 | |
2011-12-22 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1121 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1121/BillText/Filed/PDF |