FL H1121 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-255

Summary

Specifies certain revenue sources for qualification to receive revenue-sharing funds under shared revenue programs of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Town of Grant-Valkaria, Brevard County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-255
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01286
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00947; Read 3rd time -SJ 00947; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00947
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00870; Referred to Rules -SJ 00870
2010-04-23 In Messages
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00934; Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 1 -HJ 00934
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00912
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00647; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00647
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-26 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00417
2010-03-25 Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00417
2010-03-23 On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 03/25/10, 1:00 pm, 404-H
2010-03-15 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 10 NAYS 3 -HJ 00301; Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00301
2010-03-11 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/15/10, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00100
2010-03-01 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-18 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback