FL H1111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Veterans Protection Act"; prohibits person from acting as representative, agent, or attorney in preparation, presentation, or prosecution of any claim on behalf of veteran of U.S. Armed Forces under any law administered by USDVA unless such person has been issued proper credentials or accredited for such purposes; prohibits person from soliciting, contracting for, charging, or receiving any fee or compensation in preparation, presentation, or prosecution of any claim on behalf of veteran without proper credentials or accreditation; provides powers & duties of DVA; provides enforcement powers; requires department to adopt rules establishing civil penalties; provides penalty for violation of act; specifies controlling provisions with respect to conflicts between act & federal law.
Title
Veterans Affairs
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 108 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 109 | |
2011-12-21 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1111 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1111/BillText/Filed/PDF |