FL H1107 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for the personal identifying information of an injured or deceased employee which is contained in reports, notices, records, or supporting documentation held by the Department of Financial Services pursuant to the Workers' Compensation Law; providing a criminal penalty for willful and knowing disclosure of such information to an unauthorized person or entity; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#426 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#190 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#190 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-185 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2017-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 120 NAYS 0 1096 |
2017-05-03 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (127786) |
2017-05-02 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (127786) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1008 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (686415, 928923) |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-06 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-17 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1008 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1107 (Ch. 2017-185)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 1851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |