FL H1105 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits retail stores from allowing customer to try on intimate apparel in store unless over clothing or disposable shield; prohibits sale of intimate apparel that is tried on in violation of prohibition; defines term "intimate apparel."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intimate Apparel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0494 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501935Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback