FL H1103 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that regional rural development grants may be used to hire regional economic development organization professional staff; provides maximum amount of grant funding that certain economic development organizations may receive in year; revises amount of required matching funds; requires certain contracts to include certain information & be placed on certain websites; provides that improving access to & availability of broadband Internet service may be included in project that is eligible for rural infrastructure grant funds.
Title
Regional Rural Development Grants
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] | Rep. Halsey Beshears [R] |
Rep. Chris Latvala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time 606 |
2018-02-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2018-02-09 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-06 | House | CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-23 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1496 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H1193 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
H1193 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |