FL H1099 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires operators of certain motorboats to use engine cutoff switch while motorboat is making way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vessel Safety Equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1562 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback