FL H1097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises activities & projects that may be undertaken, coordinated, & funded by Florida Communities Trust to include specified flood mitigation projects; provides for maximum grant award & exceptions, application process & priority ranking, & reporting requirements; requires grant recipient reports to be publicly available.
Title
Florida Communities Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S158 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
380 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1097 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1097/BillText/Filed/PDF |