FL H1097 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1715
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1715
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for prioritization of written assessment & recommendation for person scheduled or up for review for release; revises provisions relating to petitions to hold person in custody following release & transfer to DCFS to provide for extension of certain time periods that expire after normal business hours; deletes exception for detainers for deportation to provisions requiring sexually violent predators to be committed to custody of DCFS upon expiration of incarcerative portion of all criminal sentences & disposition of any detainers; prohibits knowingly & intentionally bringing contraband into or its removal from grounds of any facility for commitment or detention of sexually violent predators; specifies items that constitute contraband.
Title
Sexually Violent Predators
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | Rep. Rachel Burgin [R] | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Paige Kreegel [R] |
Rep. William Snyder [R] | Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#128 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1066 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1066 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1715 | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 1672 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1672 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 827 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 1081 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1081 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1027 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 815 | |
2012-02-23 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 815 | |
2012-02-21 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/23/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-17 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 682 | |
2012-02-16 | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time -HJ 663 | |
2012-02-16 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-15 | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -HJ 670 | |
2012-02-13 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/15/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-02 | Now in Appropriations Committee -HJ 451 | |
2012-02-01 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 315 | |
2012-02-01 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 323 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 12:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee -HJ 237 | |
2012-01-17 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 237 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 107 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 107 | |
2011-12-20 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |