FL H1091 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person to be licensed by DHSMV as motor vehicle dealer to advertise for purchase or sale of motor vehicles; requires motor vehicle dealer advertisements to include certain information; prohibits unlicensed person from using certain vehicles to transport certain vehicles; provides for impoundment of wrecker or tow truck used in violation of licensure requirements; requires persons who advertise to provide services as secondary metals recycler to be registered with Department of Revenue; requires secondary metals recycler advertisements to include certain information; prohibits person not registered as secondary metals recycler from using wrecker or tow truck to transport certain metals; provides for impoundment of wrecker or tow truck used in violation of registration requirements; provides penalties.
Title
Advertisement of Vehicle and Metals Purchasing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-02-11 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-02-10 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1510 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
323 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 2155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |