FL H1091 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipal governments to levy assessment to fund law enforcement services; provides for methodology to charge parcel in reasonable proportion to benefits it receives; requires that ad valorem taxes be reduced; provides limits on amount of reduction in certain circumstances; provides for increases in assessments in future years, etc.
Title
Assessments to Fund Law Enforcement Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00097 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1998 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)