FL H1089 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates East Mulloch Water Control District as dependent special district; provides charter of district shall be subject to amendment or repeal by county commission; provides boundaries & powers of district; provides for assessments by district; provides an exception to general law; dissolves East Mulloch Drainage District; transfers all assets & liabilities of East Mulloch Drainage District to East Mulloch Water Control District; provides that liabilities of district are not liabilities of county commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

East Mulloch Drainage District, Lee County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#641 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-174
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time 903
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time 903
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Rules
2018-02-21SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-02-06HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-06HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/06/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-29HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-27HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback