FL H1087 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes payment of workers' compensation benefits on prepaid card under certain circumstances; revises dates applicable to calculations of annual assessments upon certain workers' compensation insurers relating to special disability trust fund; provides exemption from having to obtain certificate of authority to insurers that cover only nonresidents of U.S. under certain conditions; requires funds collected for insurer to be held in bank insured by FDIC, etc.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#417 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#417 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1004 | |
2011-05-02 | Received -SJ 718 | |
2011-04-30 | In Messages | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 940 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 836 | |
2011-04-25 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-14 | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 -HJ 776 | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-31 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 392 | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 392 | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/30/11, 10:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 210 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 94 | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 916 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7277 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 728 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |