FL H1079 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for specified portions of campus emergency response for public postsecondary educational institutions; provides exemption from public meetings requirements for meeting held for purposes relating to such portions of campus emergency response; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Campus Emergency Response for Public Postsecondary Educational Institutions
Sponsors
House Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee | Rep. Bob Rommel [R] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#186 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#186 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-184 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1224 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2017-03-31 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-13 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1224 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1079 (Ch. 2017-184)