FL H1077 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes exclusion from definition of term "convenience business" for businesses in which owner or members of his or her family work between specified hours; revises contents of notice concerning amount of cash available; exempts businesses in which owner or members of his or her family work between specified hours from specified requirements; removes administrative fee for approval & reapproval for robbery deterrence & safety training curricula.
Title
Convenience Business Security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-26 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-26 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-12-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1302 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
812 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1077 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1077/BillText/Filed/PDF |