FL H1075 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for relief of Monica Cantillo Acosta & Luis Alberto Cantillo Acosta, surviving children of Nhora Acosta by Miami-Dade County; provides for appropriation to compensate them for wrongful death of their mother, Nhora Acosta, due to injuries sustained as result of negligence of Miami-Dade County; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs. CLAIM:
Title
Relief/Acosta/Miami-Dade County
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee -HJ 210 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 93 | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1075 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1075/BillText/Filed/HTML |