FL H1073 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes office within EOG; provides for appointment of Chief Resilience Officer by Governor; creates Statewide Sea-Level Rise Task Force within office; requires DEP to serve as task force's contract administrator; requires Environmental Regulation Commission to take certain action on task force's recommendations; provides for task force repeal; provides appropriation.
Title
Statewide Office of Resiliency
Sponsors
Rep. Cyndi Stevenson [R] | Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] | Rep. Delores Hogan Johnson [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/29/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7016 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H579 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 178 passed
S178 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-119
H579 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 178 passed
S178 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-119
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1073 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1073/BillText/Filed/PDF |