FL H1071 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates act "Restoring Trust in Government Act"; provides exception to provisions relating to voting conflicts; prohibits member of Legislature from voting upon or participating in legislation inuring to personal gain or loss of member or his or her relative; prohibits member of Legislature from participating in any legislation inuring to personal gain or loss of business associate, employer, board on which member sits, principal by whom member is retained, or parent corporation or subsidiary of such principal; provides disclosure requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting Conflicts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-10 Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Rules and Calendar Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 210
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 93
2011-03-01 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1123143Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback