FL H1069 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires trial court to transfer certain criminal cases involving participants in specified programs to another jurisdiction having such program under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defendants in Specialized Courts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#244 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Chapter No. 2015-178
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-01 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-28HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-28SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-23SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1170
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-23SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-22SenateReceived
2015-04-22SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-22SenateIn Messages
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-03HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2015-04-03HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-02HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2015-03-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-25HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2015-03-25HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-03-19HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-18HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-16HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1170 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178)
S1452 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178)
H7113 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178)
S7068 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
910035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback