FL H1065 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises boundaries of the district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Melbourne-Tillman Water Control District, Brevard County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#114 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Chapter No. 2019-175
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-17SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HousePassed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-08HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-25HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/25/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback