FL H1063 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes specified municipal lands within corporate limits of City of Palm Bay; provides that county is responsible for excluded territory; provides applicability with respect to existing contracts, property rights & entitlements.
Title
City of Palm Bay, Brevard County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#100 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#100 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Chapter No. 2019-176 | |
2019-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/01/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-14 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-12 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
171 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
180 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |