FL H1055 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for a trade secret held by an agency; providing that an agency employee is not liable for the release of certain records; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Trade Secrets

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#410 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Chapter No. 2021-223
2021-06-29 Approved by Governor
2021-06-28 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2021-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 2
2021-04-28HouseAmendment 418456 Concur
2021-04-28HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2021-04-28HouseIn Messages
2021-04-28SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateAmendment(s) adopted (418456)
2021-04-28SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/21
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-20SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2021-04-20SenateFavorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Rules (418456); YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-08SenateReceived
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-07HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-07SenateIn Messages
2021-04-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
2021-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-03-31HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-03-31HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-25HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021)
2021-03-24HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-24HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-03-24HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable by State Affairs Committee
2021-03-22HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-03-16HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-03-16HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-03-16HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-03-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-12HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-10House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-10HouseCS Filed
2021-03-10HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseFavorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseAdded to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-02-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1446 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1055 (Ch. 2021-223)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190715Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Amendment/213117/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Amendment/418456/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055a.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055d.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055e.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/2021h01055.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/2021h01055.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055z.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Analyses/h1055z1.GOS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Vote/HouseVote_h01055c1045.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Vote/SenateVote_h01055c1003.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Vote/HouseVote_h01055c1410.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57935&IsPCB=0&BillId=72151
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58892&IsPCB=0&BillId=72151
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59186&IsPCB=0&BillId=72151
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1055/Vote/2021-04-20%200830AM~H01055%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback