FL H1055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemptions from public records requirements for personal information in certain vessel records & for certain e-mail addresses & verified texting numbers held by DHSMV; provides exemption from public records requirements for information received by DHSMV as result of certain investigations or examinations; authorizes release of confidential information under certain circumstances; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1053 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S7094 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3191414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback