FL H1055 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires FWCC, DACS, & DEP to enforce certain provisions, adopted rules, & issued orders; creates Bear-Resistant Garbage Container Account within Nongame Wildlife Trust Fund; requires FWCC to establish process through which certain local governments may obtain loans to purchase bear-resistant garbage containers; prohibits harvesting of saw palmetto berries & sale of timber rights on state lands identified as Florida black bear habitat; requires burn schedules for state forests & parks containing Florida black bear habitat to be adjusted to meet certain conditions; requires FWCC to designate Florida black bear habitat & post such areas on website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Black Bears

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-08HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-12-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1096 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
S1674 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3793018Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback