FL H1055 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes licensed septic tank contractors to perform maintenance & repair on drainfields of certain aerobic treatment unit systems; provides conditions under which owners of existing onsite sewage treatment & disposal systems are allowed to use the systems as integral parts of sanitary sewer systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Onsite Sewage Treatment and Disposal Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied on Calendar
2014-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-04-07HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2014-04-07HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2014-04-04HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2014-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2014-03-31HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2014-03-31HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2014-03-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/14, 11:00 am, Webster Hall
2014-03-21HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2014-03-19HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2014-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2014-03-18HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2014-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2014-03-05HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1306 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Agriculture

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100655Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback