FL H1049 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies salaries of full-time judges of compensation claims & Deputy Chief Judge of Compensation Claims; provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the Judges of Compensation Claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#576 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Vetoed by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1298
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-06HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee
2020-02-06HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2020-02-05HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-12-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1298 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1049

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback