FL H1039 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes excise tax on recreational marijuana; exempts certain activities involving marijuana from use & possession offenses; authorizes persons age 21 & over to engage in certain activities involving personal use of marijuana in limited amounts; provides limits on where persons may engage in specified activities; provides for licensure of marijuana establishments that may engage in manufacture, possession or purchase of marijuana, marijuana products & marijuana accessories or sell marijuana, marijuana products or marijuana accessories to consumer; provides for enforcement; provides for limits on number of retail marijuana stores in localities based on population; provides standards for prospective licensees; provides restrictions on location of marijuana establishments; prohibits certain activities by marijuana establishments; authorizes localities to prohibit one or more types of marijuana establishments; provides an exemption from specified provisions for marijuana research.
Title
Recreational Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1562 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 0311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 0073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1039 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1039/BillText/Filed/PDF |