FL H1039 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that school zero tolerance policies only require reporting of acts that poses serious threat to school safety to law enforcement & to otherwise handle acts within their own disciple systems; provides requirements for referrals of juveniles to criminal or juvenile justice systems for petty acts of misconduct or misdemeanors; requires school districts to assign expelled students to disciplinary program during period of expulsion; revises requirements for agreements between school districts & law enforcement agencies; requires that certain polices be provided to DOE annually; provides for model policy; making distribution of certain funds contingent on compliance with specified procedures; requires an annual report by commissioner of Education; requires approval of certain policies in order to receive certain funds; provides that certain funds may be used for specified activities.
Title
School Zero-Tolerance Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1374 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1039 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1039/BillText/Filed/PDF |