FL H1033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Chapter No. 2019-160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & provides provisions related to continuing care contracts including financing, refinancing, procedures & standards for certificates of authority & provisional certificates, escrowed funds, provider acquisitions, expansion of facilities, rulemaking, filing of information, management contracts, minimum standards, procedures for providers not meeting standards, & composition of Continuing Care Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Care Contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#253 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28 Chapter No. 2019-160
2019-06-27 Approved by Governor
2019-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1070
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (054701, 200477) 885
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HouseCS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-19HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-18HouseCS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall
2019-04-08HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-04-05HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-29HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1070 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2019-160)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
651011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6511065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6511141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/Amendment/378723/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/Amendment/406379/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/Amendment/054701/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/Amendment/200477/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/Vote/HouseVote_h01033c3253.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1033/Vote/SenateVote_h01033e1007.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback